FARLEY ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Farley Arts Trust undertakes an arts and education programme of visual arts exhibitions, talks, lectures and performances, in addition to education visits, workshops and projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 June 2004: Standard registration
- FARLEYS YARD TRUST COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRISELDA BEAR | Chair | 16 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Daniel David Anstey Butcher | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tony Biggin | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HELEN COLEBOURN | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Margaret Alice Mary Sweatman | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK EDWARD BARRETT | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY PENROSE | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA MARY TIDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £768 | £10.00k | £101 | £2.04k | £265 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £4.75k | £2.18k | £2.20k | £3.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/06/2013
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ARTS AND CRAFTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART MOVEMENT KNOWN AS SURREALISM B) ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE AND SCIENCE C) CONSERVE AND PROTECT FARLEYS BARN AND ITS COLLECTIONS HOUSED WITHIN AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF EAST SUSSEX AND THE NATION AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farley Farm
Muddles Green
Chiddingly
LEWES
East Sussex
BN8 6HW
- Phone:
- 07876 747 291
- Email:
- me.eb17@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window