FRIENDS OF BRINKLEY GROVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to support Brinkley Grove Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 05 April 2004: Standard registration
- 09 January 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 February 2013: Re-registered
- FOBGS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE YOUNG | Chair | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.86k | £2.32k | £840 | £2.30k | £8.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.57k | £489 | £432 | £1.95k | £8.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 June 2023 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 June 2023 | 735 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 April 2021 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brinkley Grove Primary School
Rawlings Crescent
Highwoods
Colchester
CO4 9GF
- Phone:
- 01206852266
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window