Broadheath Central Football Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football Club for boys and girls for age group 4 to adults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Trafford
Governance
- 05 October 2004: Standard registration
- BROADHEATH CENTRAL JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Carr | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Corbett | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN MCGUINNESS | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.53k | £122.94k | £200.10k | £195.00k | £176.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.55k | £155.19k | £190.41k | £204.55k | £196.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 12 AUGUST 2004. as amended on 01 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED FROM 5 TO 18 BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM TO PLAY FOOTBALL SO THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BROADHEATH, CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadheath Central Club
Viaduct Road
Broadheath
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 5DX
- Phone:
- 0161 928 5849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window