MRS CHARLOTTE JORDAN SIMSON WILL TRUST R5903
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Must pay its income to the RNLI to fund the purchase of a lifeboat. Once the lifeboat has been purchased, it must then split its income between four named charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2005: Standard registration
- 22 November 2010: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.36k | £18.38k | £18.44k | £19.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.86k | £24.53k | £24.08k | £22.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 09 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 31 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 07 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 19 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 19 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 12 February 2007 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 12 February 2007 | 7 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL AND CODICIL PROVED AT THE PRINCIPAL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 08 MAY 1940 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 29 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
NET INCOME WAS TO BE PAID TO THE RNLI FOR THE PURPOSES OF ENDOWING A LIFEBOAT AND THEREAFTER THE EXCESS OF INCOME IS TO BE PAID EQUALLY BETWEEN THE RNLI , ST DUNSTANS, THE ROYAL MASONIC TRUST FOR GIRLS AND BOYS AND BARNADOS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window