Accounts and annual returns SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST LINE

Charity number: 1108117
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 February 2014 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 13 February 2014 13 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 30 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 30 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 31 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 31 January 2012 On Time