Financial history SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST LINE

Charity Number: 1108117
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £130.01k £139.09k £84.85k £51.83k £53.75k
Total expenditure £91.23k £136.78k £121.14k £76.55k £49.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A