THE SYNERGY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objects & Principal Activities Education and training for young people Alleviation of social exclusion and deprivation Empowerment of young people Regeneration of local community Please refer to Trustee Report for fuller explanation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 14 April 2004: Standard registration
- THE BRIXTON SYNERGY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Younger | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Peake | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ELLISON | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|||||
STEVEN PEAKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £5.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 March 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 APRIL 2006 as amended on 14 May 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THROUGH EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), PARTICULARLY IN THE SKILLS AND EXPERIENCE THEY NEED TO TAKE A MORE ACTIVE AND PARTICIPATORY ROLE IN COMMUNITY, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL LIFE THEREBY PROMOTING GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Crown Office Row
119 Church Street
BRIGHTON
BN1 1UD
- Phone:
- 07766566691
- Email:
- info@thesynergycentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window