NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HEALTH & SAFETY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision & promotion of good health & safety practice by training courses, monthly meetings, monthly newsletter, helpline & website. Links with ASE, EH depts of local authorities cooperation with IOSH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 December 2004: Standard registration
- NSHSG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Richardson | Chair | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Johnson | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Durber | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Teresa Broadhurst | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE MULLOCK President | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.58k | £8.98k | £18 | £3.89k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £4.99k | £3.72k | £2.70k | £2.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2004. as amended on 09 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY INCREASING AWARENESS IN OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH, SAFETY AND WELFARE AMONGST INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL AND OTHER INTERESTED ORGANISATIONS SO THAT METHODS OF ACCIDENT PREVENTION MAY BE STUDIED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Brampton Road
NEWCASTLE
ST5 0SJ
- Phone:
- 07814888896
- Email:
- samantha@ormemidlands.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window