HACKNEY ASSOCIATION YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provisions of sports, music, interpreting, translation, provision of free advice on energy, health matters, provision on education and employment training, housing, organisation of seminars/workshops, meeting, summer play-scheme, trips, events, cultural activities and art development for disadvantaged young people who are black minority ethnic living in Hackney/London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 07 May 2004: Standard registration
- H. A. YOU. C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Polipo Pompome Chair | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Youlou Dembo Advisor | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chanto Boyino Treasurer | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Smith Secretary | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.37k | £14.63k | £15.00k | £14.91k | £14.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.10k | £14.42k | £14.79k | £14.81k | £14.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 April 2025 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF AFRICAN YOUNG REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF REGARDING THEIR EDUCATIONAL, TRAINING EMPLOYMENT NEEDS AS WELL AS ADVICE ON HEALTH MATTERS, HOUSING, IMMIGRATION, INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING AND ADVOCACY.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Park Road
TREORCHY
Mid Glamorgan
CF42 6LA
- Phone:
- 07730190386
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window