ROWHEDGE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to advance the education of the public in the history and development of Rowhedge by the provision and maintenance of educational facilities, services and events. The Trust works to harness and focus the goodwill of residents in Rowhedge (and beyond) towards building a strong community and and sharing their interest and expertise with the rest of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 28 June 2004: Standard registration
- RHT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Peter Davy | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Marlow-Mann | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Holloway | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nick Vashon Baker | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE JOAN BAKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Keith James PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £138 | £582 | £1.34k | £5.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24k | £417 | £1.63k | £2.54k | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 MAY 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 27 MAY 2004. as amended on 29 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF ROWHEDGE BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN EDUCATIONAL HERITAGE CENTRE AND MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
ROWHEDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Parkfield Street
Rowhedge
COLCHESTER
CO5 7EL
- Phone:
- 07759606802
- Email:
- keithjphillips@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window