Trustees ST ANDREW'S CLUB
Charity number: 1103322

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Cuffy | Chair | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Zie Forrester Bardolph | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grazyna Richmond | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Watson | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sweeney | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HITCHCOCK | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SCOTT | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN OXLEY | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE PARISH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.