Trustees DANCE ACTION ZONE LEEDS / DAZL

Charity number: 1106394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wayne Sables Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
WYN IRENE KIDGER Trustee 30 September 2015
None on record
JANET MATTHEWS Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
SUSAN RAUTENBERG Trustee 22 November 2012
None on record
EMMA CLAYTON Trustee 10 January 2012
None on record
HELEN LINSELL Trustee 10 January 2012
None on record