MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MS International Federation is a global network of organisations. We collaborate to improve the quality of life of people affected by MS and work for: better scientific understanding and development of treatments; improved access to treatment and to trustworthy information; better policies and practices; a strong MS movement, including in countries with challenging socio-economic conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,906,004
Donations and legacies | £1.48m | |
Charitable activities | £384.99k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £23.25k | |
Other | £15.03k |
Total expenditure:
£2,131,503
Raising funds | £347.93k | |
Charitable activities | £1.78m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £347.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m |
People

19 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Mexico
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Yemen
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 August 2004: Standard registration
- MSIF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rohan Greenland | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dana Foote | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan van Amstel | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rami Ayach | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Magd Zakaria | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hemant Nerurkar | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Frederic Marie Jacques de Leusse | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martinus Desmet | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ava Battles | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pamela Valentine | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Sofia Prato Chichiraldi | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Herbert Temmes | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Annis | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Klaus Hom | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ana Torredemer | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dimitra Kalogianni | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MARTIN STEVENS | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARIO ALBERTO BATTAGLIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81m | £2.82m | £2.28m | £1.97m | £1.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02m | £2.30m | £2.16m | £2.44m | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.47m | £2.48m | £1.92m | £1.58m | £1.48m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £327.99k | £338.88k | £354.12k | £367.82k | £384.99k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.15k | £1.66k | £198 | £5.80k | £23.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £10.12k | £0 | £0 | £22.45k | £15.03k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.99k | £22.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.89m | £2.09m | £1.86m | £1.96m | £1.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £135.45k | £215.65k | £292.07k | £486.11k | £347.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.45k | £13.63k | £9.09k | £46.26k | £76.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £435.98k | £817.92k | £482.60k | £285.85k | £164.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.33k | £2.52k | £3.68k | £1.21k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.40m | £2.45m | £2.58m | £2.00m | £1.34m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £359.22k | £887.32k | £903.24k | £786.48k | £351.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 February 2023 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 February 2023 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 AUGUST 2004. as amended on 11 Apr 2019 as amended on 21 Jul 2021 as amended on 10 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO SUPPORT AND RELIEVE PERSONS AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND ALLIED CONDITIONS WORLDWIDE BY:- 1) PROMOTING, STIMULATING AND ENCOURAGING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH WORLDWIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE INTO THE CAUSES OF AND CURE AND TREATMENT FOR MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND ALLIED CONDITIONS WITH THE AIM OF ELIMINATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS; 2) AIDING, SUPPORTING AND RELIEVING PERSONS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND ALLIED CONDITIONS, TO ENCOURAGE THEM IN EVERY WAY POSSIBLE TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE; PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT AND WORK AND PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS ORGANISATIONS OR THE FORMATION OF SUCH ORGANISATIONS; 3) EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS BY, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, COLLECTING AND DISSEMINATING SCIENTIFIC AND EDUCATIONAL INFORMATION RELATING TO MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS; 5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
Unit A
Arc House
82 Tanner Street
LONDON
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 02076201911
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window