AL-JAMIA DARUL QURAN BOLTON UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING PRAYER FACILITIES FOR THE RUMWORTH AREA BOLTON PROVIDES ISLAMIC EDUCATION TO YOUNG CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IBRAHIM AHMED PATEL | Chair | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Adam Patel | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAWOOD AHMED ESSA | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAWOOD UMAR | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MEHBOOB ADAM PATEL | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.53k | £144.78k | £215.39k | £204.50k | £197.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.70k | £111.78k | £138.59k | £141.24k | £133.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND BELIEFS OF THE AHLE SUNNAT WAL JAMAAT OF THE SUNNI HANAFI SECT OF MUSLIMS AND THE DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE BOLTON, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
454-460 BRIDGEMAN STREET
BOLTON
BL3 6TJ
- Phone:
- 01204659099
- Website:
-
WWW.DARULQURANBOLTON.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window