Financial history ST SIMEON'S CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1103383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £13.47k £11.46k £4.83k £6.18k £4.00k
Total expenditure £853 £374.38k £13.19k £8.95k £5.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A