THE WELLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training/Relief of poverty/Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Elizabeth Boxall | Chair | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Francis Plummer | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Musendo | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Haydon Charles William Murr | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Boocock | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ayodele Adewole | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.06k | £152.96k | £194.53k | £212.80k | £249.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.43k | £162.83k | £176.73k | £195.07k | £208.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 January 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 January 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD GENERALLY INCLUDING BY THE WORSHIP OF GOD, THE INSTRUCTION AND EDIFICATION OF CHRISTIANS, THE CARE AND CHRISTIAN INSTRUCTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN AND THE EVANGELISATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG ALL PEOPLES OF THE WORLD; 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND 3.1.4 TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Well Community Church
Wells Way
London
SE5 7SY
- Phone:
- 02077030924
- Email:
- admin@thewellcc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window