Governing document Greenfield Primary Parent Teacher Association

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 2004. as amended on 13 May 2019 as amended on 22 Feb 2021 as amended on 10 Mar 2021 as amended on 26 Apr 2021 as amended on 26 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.