Financial history TRINITY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1103453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £629.65k £484.71k £603.08k £616.17k £736.28k
Total expenditure £603.61k £481.54k £509.92k £642.92k £735.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £69.41k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £5.00k £69.41k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.61k N/A £14.48k £40.48k £2.82k
Income - Other trading activities £606.33k N/A £350.49k £418.82k £153.60k
Income - Charitable activities £19.37k N/A £31.18k £10.99k £535.12k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £346 N/A £23 £882 £3.23k
Income - Other £0 N/A £206.91k £145.00k £41.52k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.73k N/A £0 £639.64k £735.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £589.89k N/A £509.92k £3.28k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0