Financial history REIGATE PARISH CHURCH PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1103371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £48.36k £59.05k £31.63k £40.27k £39.27k
Total expenditure £60.43k £61.73k £24.71k £53.77k £36.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A