ACCENTURE DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIPS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The overall goal of Accenture Development Partnerships is to channel Accenture's capabilities and assets to help address international development challanges, working in collaboration with non-profit and non-governmental organisations, foundations and donor agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
- Cambodia
- Costa Rica
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Niger
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 January 2005: Standard registration
- 09 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 22 October 2019 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 19 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 22ND DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
3.1 PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR WORKING IN POOR COUNTRIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND TECHNOLOGY SKILLS TO VOLUNTARY SECTOR ORGANISATIONS. (DEFINITIONS OF "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" "CHARITIES" AND "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS") 3.2 RELIEVE POVERTY IN POOR COUNTRIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR AREAS OF THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND TECHNOLOGY SKILLS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISES WHERE THE INCREASE IN CAPACITY FROM THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION WILL RELIEVE POVERTY IN THOSE AREAS. 3.3 RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND TECHNOLOGY SKILLS TO GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS AND OTHER STATUTORY BODIES WHERE THE LACK OF CAPACITY IN THOSE DEPARTMENTS OR BODIES INHIBITS THEIR DELIVERY OF ASSISTANCE WHICH IS DESIGNED TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND/OR PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH IN POOR COUNTRIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR AREAS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window