HALSTEAD IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clear clean and florally decorate Halstead for the benefit of residents, those who work in the Town and our many visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 08 July 2004: Standard registration
- HIB (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Jennifer Rees | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MARY SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.77k | £6.30k | £7.41k | £10.30k | £9.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.64k | £17.63k | £18.78k | £19.89k | £23.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HALSTEAD AND BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS, SHRUBS AND LANDSCAPES IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND BY HOLDING FLORAL COMPETITIONS. 2) TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND ENHANCE THE AMENITIES OF THE TOWN OF HALSTEAD WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS THEREOF BY PROMOTING THE PREVENTION AND CONTROL OF LITTER, AND TO RAISE AWARENESS OF ENVIRONMENTAL CONCERNS IN THE TOWN AND TO DO SUCH LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
HALSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Woodyard
Southey Green
SIBLE HEDINGHAM
Halstead
Essex
CO9 3RN
- Phone:
- 01787461806
- Email:
- jaygrey@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window