Financial history THE WINE GUILD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1105374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £25.45k £26.22k £250 £250 £350
Total expenditure £48.74k £15.31k £406 £487 £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A