THE GURKHA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1103669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Gurkha Welfare Trust is the leading Gurkha charity. We provide financial, medical and development aid to Gurkha veterans, their families and communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • India
  • Nepal
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2004: Standard registration
  • 08 February 2021: Funds received from 1002828 THE HAYWARD SURRY TRUST FUND
  • 15 February 2021: Funds received from 1021780 STANLEY CLAYTON TRUST
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Major General Gerald Mark Strickland DSO MBE Chair 13 September 2024
Nepal Nature Trust
Received: On time
Dr Alison Jane Everest Trustee 10 December 2024
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF ENVIROMENTAL CLEANERS CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
Brigadier Jody Davies MBE Trustee 14 December 2023
THE GURKHA MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Ranjani Kearsley Trustee 13 April 2023
None on record
Colonel David John Robinson Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
John Geoffrey Rupert David Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Patrick Mark Allan Grant Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Hemchandra Rai MBE BEM Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Ann Levin Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Stephen Cooper Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £25.26m £22.05m £25.51m £24.60m £27.95m
Total expenditure £22.50m £20.55m £22.71m £24.44m £24.47m
Income from government contracts £4.04m £970.00k £1.93m £1.75m £1.64m
Income from government grants £5.47m £5.88m £5.85m £6.09m £8.49m
Income - Donations and legacies £15.91m £16.59m £18.32m £16.43m £17.19m
Income - Other trading activities £518.00k £182.00k £694.00k £576.00k £545.00k
Income - Charitable activities £6.64m £3.50m £4.46m £4.89m £7.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.20m £1.78m £2.05m £2.70m £3.14m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £6.41m £5.00m £8.00m £6.66m £6.92m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.02m £18.09m £20.07m £21.60m £21.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.48m £2.47m £2.63m £2.84m £3.19m
Expenditure - Governance £244.00k £225.00k £230.00k £257.00k £268.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £250.00k £250.00k £250.00k £250.00k £250.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £317.00k £347.00k £372.00k £355.00k £364.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £2.04m £2.08m £2.00m £2.02m £2.17m
Long-term investments £69.18m £86.13m £81.43m £82.34m £92.94m
Other assets £13.43m £7.16m £10.69m £10.96m £9.92m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £40.47m £38.39m £40.22m £36.99m £40.41m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE GURKHA WELFARE TRUST
PO BOX 2170
22 QUEEN STREET
SALISBURY
SP2 2EX
Phone:
01722323955