PERSIAN CARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have provided a therapeutic space and non threatening environment for elders to meet and exchange ideas and where they can continued to build their knowledge of loacl resources. Trusting relationships are gradually built up with statutory and non statutory services . this is making a contributions to the way in which elders are enabled t obuild their networks, reduce fear and a sense of iso
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 02 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rubecka Anwar Mahmoodi | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosana Ordoubadi | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jalil Tannazi | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.74k | £11.15k | £24.86k | £7.24k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.56k | £13.77k | £18.53k | £14.47k | £5.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29TH AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3RD JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF FARSI SPEAKING PEOPLE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY SOCIAL CARE AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE INFIRMITY POVERTY AND/OR EXCLUSION. 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR FARSI SPEAKING PEOPLE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
FARSI SPEAKING PEOPLE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
245 WALMER ROAD
LONDON
W11 4EY
- Phone:
- 07961447116
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window