WOODARD SCHOOLS (NOTTINGHAMSHIRE) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are part of The Woodard Corporation (charity No 1096270) and we strive for the best all round education of every aspect of each individual. We are a Christian foundation and adhere to the Catholic foundation as found in the church and support the care of each individual and the whole school community particularised in the ministry of the school chaplains.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£10,908,923
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £9.86m | |
Other trading activities | £552.70k | |
Investments | £1.45k | |
Other | £497.38k |
Total expenditure:
£10,360,048
Raising funds | £574.01k | |
Charitable activities | £9.79m | |
Other | £0 |
-£5,786 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £574.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.79m | |
Retained for future use | £548.88k |
People

238 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON CHARLES BARNSDALE | Chair | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Maskell | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Conroy | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Charles Phillips | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel James Porter | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Gilbert Ross | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Peake | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kumar Muthukumarappan | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.48m | £7.45m | £9.15m | £9.24m | £10.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44m | £9.01m | £8.88m | £8.96m | £10.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £527.47k | £686.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.25k | £2.55k | £687.90k | £7.12k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £598.03k | £187.23k | £196.30k | £298.25k | £552.70k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.81m | £6.72m | £7.72m | £8.87m | £9.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.70k | £15.79k | £24 | £3.07k | £1.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £53.52k | £527.47k | £540.03k | £58.87k | £497.38k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.79m | £8.63m | £8.66m | £8.72m | £9.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £652.99k | £387.85k | £221.96k | £240.75k | £574.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.46k | £45.41k | £43.25k | £30.29k | £56.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.42k | £2.19k | £503 | £458 | £365 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.59m | £11.32m | £11.14m | £11.10m | £10.91m | |
|
Long-term investments | £475.29k | £155.96k | £173.62k | £171.11k | £161.02k | |
|
Other assets | £2.45m | £1.85m | £1.97m | £2.09m | £2.85m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£221.26k | -£191.17k | -£156.49k | -£50.90k | -£42.48k | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.87m | £9.26m | £8.98m | £8.89m | £8.91m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 2004. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 JANUARY 2006, 23 JUNE 2009 AND 28 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES WHICH GOVERN THE CHARITY CALLED THE WOODARD CORPORATION WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE IN PARTICULAR BY CARRYING ON THE SCHOOLS KNOWN AS WORKSOP COLLEGE AND RANBY HOUSE SCHOOL AND ANY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS ASSOCIATED WITH THEM.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worksop College
Enquiry Office
Cuthberts Avenue
WORKSOP
S80 3AP
- Phone:
- 01909537100
- Email:
- finance@wsnl.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window