KOLLEL SHEFA CHAIM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE KOLLEL SHEFA CHAIM IS CONSTITUTED BY TRUST DEED, AND ITS OBJECTS ARE TO PROVIDE GENERAL CHARITABLE DONATIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £20,000 from 20000 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 May 2004: Standard registration
- KOLLEL SANZ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KLEIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHAIM INTRATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVROHOM LIEBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.49k | £92.08k | £88.93k | £74.57k | £147.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.53k | £81.68k | £82.84k | £92.05k | £143.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2022
(These accounts |
20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2021
(These accounts |
14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 2. TO ADVANCE ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION 3. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kollel Shefa Chaim
124 Stamford Hill
London
N16 6QT
- Phone:
- 0792001016
- Email:
- kolllelsanz@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window