FRIENDS OF FOLKESTONE ACADEMY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal activity is to advance for the public benefit, education in the United Kingdom, in particular, supporting the aims and objectives of Folkestone Academy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 23 April 2004: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE FOLKESTONE AND MARLOWE ACADEMIES (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE MARLOWE ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ROGER DE HAAN CBE DL | Chair |
|
||||||
Louisa Hope Coppins | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Am'e Leigh Moris | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Luke | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PEARCE | Trustee | 03 October 2006 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BADMAN CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.00k | £196.00k | £219.00k | £218.00k | £205.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.00k | £159.00k | £40.00k | £191.00k | £275.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 December 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 09 December 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 AUG 2017 as amended on 02 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are: (a) the advancement for the public benefit of education in the United Kingdom including, without limitation, to further in whatever manner and by whatever means the aims, objects, activities and enterprises of the schools currently known as Folkestone Academy and Folkestone Primary Academy whose principal premises are situated at Academy Lane, Folkestone, CT19 5FP ('Folkestone Academy'); (b) the relief of unemployment for the public benefit in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment; (c) the provision of facilities, in the interests of social welfare, for recreation and other leisure time occupation with the object of improving conditions of life, in particular for the inhabitants of South East Kent; and (d) the furthering of such other charitable purposes as the Trustees shall think fit; (together the 'Objects').
Area of benefit
SOUTH-EAST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Strand House
Pilgrims Way
Monks Horton
ASHFORD
TN25 6DR
- Phone:
- 01303817543
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window