Financial history TUNBRIDGE WELLS CRISIS RECOVERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1103772
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.15k £4.73k £4.78k £1.50k £285
Total expenditure £3.59k £4.91k £5.01k £3.43k £314
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A