HAIG COLLIERY MINING MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 May 2004: Standard registration
- 05 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £449.06k | £138.64k | £190.56k | £286.60k | £72.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457.24k | £132.34k | £179.01k | £282.86k | £125.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE MINING HISTORY OF CUMBRIA, IN PARTICULAR, COAL MINING IN WEST CUMBRIA BY MAINTAINING A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION OF TOOLS, MACHINERY, GEOLOGICAL SPECIMENS, RECORDS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND ARCHIVES AND BY DEMONSTRATION OF PAST AND CONTEMPORARY MINING METHODS. (B) TO EXPLORE, RESEARCH AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CUMBRIA, AND THE NATION AT LARGE, SUCH OF THE HISTORIC MINING REMAINS AND RELATED INDUSTRIAL WORKINGS AS MAY ASSIST IN THE COUNTRY OF CUMBRIA AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
IN THE COUNTRY OF CUMBRIA AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window