ROYAL AUXILIARY AIR FORCE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recording, preserving and promoting the ethos, history and traditions of the RAuxAF from its founding in 1924 up to the present day. This includes, inter alia, the maintenance of, and organisation of events relating to, the RAuxAF Memorial at the NMA, the RAuxAF Roll of Honour in St Clement Danes Church, the RAuxAF Archives and the Foundation's website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 July 2004: Standard registration
- ROYAL AUXILIARY AIR FORCE NATIONAL MEMORIAL ARBORETUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GROUP CAPTAIN RICHARD THOMAS WILLIAM MIGHALL OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Squadron Leader Jane Louisa Drew | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Paul Cameron | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Group Captain Robert G Kemp CBE | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wing Commander Jeffrey Metcalfe | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
WING COMMANDER CHARLES B HYDE OBE | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Anthony Freeman | Trustee | 01 April 2004 |
|
|
||||
GP CAPT GARY WAYNE BUNKELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 01/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.86k | £305 | £317 | £21.62k | £6.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.22k | £0 | £0 | £17.77k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 03/08/2011
Charitable objects
(I) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A ROYAL AUXILIARY AIR FORCE MEMORIAL AT THE NATIONAL MEMORIAL ARBORETUM, IN MEMORY OF THOSE PERSONNEL WHO SERVED IN THE FORCE DURING THE 20TH CENTURY, THEREBY ENCOURAGING PUBLIC RECOGNITION OF THE SACRIFICE MADE BY SUCH PERSONS. (II) IF AND SO FAR AS THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECTS SPECIFIED IN CLAUSE (I) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR SERVING OR FORMER SERVICE PERSONNEL AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Chapel Garth
Holme-On-Spalding-Moor
East Riding of Yorkshire
YO43 4EG
- Phone:
- 01430861318
- Email:
- jeffmetty18@gmail.com
- Website:
-
rauxaf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window