ALIVE AND KICKING U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alive and Kicking exist to create happier, healthier, more empowered communities. As the world's only not-for-profit sports ball manufacturer, we positively impact the lives and livelihoods of people facing disadvantage by producing a sports ball like no other - creating better access to ethical jobs, play and vital health education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £6,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
226 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Kenya
- Zambia
Governance
- 20 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Kenny | Chair | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Duncan | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Keane | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nasta | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Begg | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WILLIAM FLECKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOE COGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES APPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANNY GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRISTRAM JONES-PARRY MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £369.69k | £252.49k | £300.76k | £304.16k | £459.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.19k | £274.02k | £258.04k | £334.78k | £449.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £12.86k | £6.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 AUGUST 2004 as amended on 18 Feb 2020 as amended on 18 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
The Charity's Objects are, for the public benefit: I. The relief of unemployment in communities facing disadvantage, primarily in sub-Saharan Africa, in such ways as the trustees think fit, including through the production of sports balls. II. The advancement of physical education across communities facing disadvantage, primarily in sub-Saharan Africa, through the provision of ethically made sports balls and sport participation programmes. III. The promotion of health across communities facing disadvantage, primarily in the UK and sub-Saharan Africa, through the delivery of health education programmes.
Area of benefit
EAST AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alive & Kicking
147 Hoxton Street
LONDON
N1 6QG
- Phone:
- 02076869852
- Email:
- info@aliveandkicking.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window