SOUTHAMPTON MENCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southampton Mencap works to support people with a learning disability and their parents or carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £341,536 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southampton City
Governance
- 11 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Mary Linssen | Chair | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Frances Clare Mar-Molinero | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Rankin | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Stead | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Miriam Bernstein | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mar-Molinero | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
HEIDI OLDREY | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev BRIAN LLOYD STREVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS J STREVENS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £704.28k | £669.11k | £679.50k | £646.83k | £372.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £644.35k | £612.53k | £638.30k | £680.05k | £402.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £410.26k | £583.40k | £607.40k | £589.25k | £341.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.56k | £8.32k | £14.23k | £2.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.82k | £4.26k | £2.22k | £4.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.39k | £883 | £22 | £1.09k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £698.01k | £663.93k | £677.26k | £641.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £65 | £30 | £3 | £63 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £644.09k | £612.32k | £638.25k | £679.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £255 | £216 | £54 | £81 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.20k | £28.13k | £29.06k | £32.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MIND. MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mencap
187A Portswood Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO17 2NF
- Phone:
- 02380333301
- Email:
- alex@southamptonmencap.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window