Financial history MEATH GREEN INFANT SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1103693
Charity reporting is up to date (277 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £24.93k £13.94k £15.86k £24.40k £20.79k
Total expenditure £24.62k £10.12k £17.65k £22.53k £13.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A