SUPPORT UNIT, CORPS OF DRUMS, 'C' COMPANY, STAFFORDSHIRE ARMY CADET FORCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-Raising, training and logistic support for band activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 April 2004: Standard registration
- 11 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SUPPORT UNIT, CORPS OF DRUMS STAFFORDSHIRE ACF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2006 | 01/04/2007 | 01/04/2008 | 01/04/2009 | 01/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £848 | £3.97k | £650 | £69 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £811 | £3.17k | £330 | £610 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2010 | 06 April 2011 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2009 | 03 May 2010 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS AND LEADERS OF THE (NAME OF BAND) SUPPORT UNIT, CORPS OF DRUMS, 'C' COMPANY, STAFFS, AFC YOUTH MARCHING BAND AND THE PROMOTION OF MENTAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO 18 YEARS OF AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, COMPETITIONS, CONCERTS OF MUSIC AND DANCE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window