Financial history SCHOOL HOUSE NURSERY (SANDWICH) LTD

Charity number: 1103787
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £179.12k £119.27k £92.27k £126.24k £132.26k
Total expenditure £140.48k £134.20k £68.52k £10.70k £10.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £12.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.00k £12.00k