Accounts and annual returns KENYA COMMUNITY SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1104003
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2020 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required