Financial history NORTH LIVERPOOL ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1103623
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £2.48m £12.16m £19.20m £31.76m £10.73m
Total expenditure £1.70m £8.12m £8.31m £8.96m £10.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.00k £0 £1.00m £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £65.00k £74.00k £66.00k £52.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £11.84m £18.68m £30.45m £10.37m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £101.00k £141.00k £49.00k £4.00k
Income - Other N/A £150.00k £311.00k £195.00k £304.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £8.02m £8.11m £8.83m £10.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £103.00k £161.00k £134.00k £134.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £37.00k £0 £0