Financial history NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 1103563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £101.04k £194.55k £25.30k £38.52k £205.75k
Total expenditure £28.56k £63.12k £74.51k £54.75k £184.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.20k N/A