BREATH OF GOD'S MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities are purely based on preaching the gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ. We have planted churches oversea in Uganda, Nigeria and currently about to plant one in Birmingham (Jan. 09). We have an outreach on www.connectuganda.com run by one of the pastors. Leading youths to becoming responsible adults with purposeful life, adult counselling,are some examples of the activities we embark on.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Theodore Onye | Chair | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
EVANGELIST ELIJAH EMEH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ENOCH KWADWO BOATENG-AMPOMSAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIBISOLA BANWO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.40k | £10.45k | £9.04k | £10.02k | £22.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £10.29k | £9.10k | £10.02k | £12.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK, AND 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
735 OLD KENT ROAD
LONDON
SE15 1JL
- Phone:
- 02074697424
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window