BANKFOOT PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for education and training, recreation and other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life of those for whom the facilities are provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Total income includes £4,000 from government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 25 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES WILLIAM HINTON | Chair |
|
||||||
ALAN ENGLISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.07k | £65.24k | £49.20k | £14.78k | £11.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.41k | £64.75k | £59.08k | £13.53k | £10.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED ON 5 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BANKFOOT, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BANKFOOT, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ELIZABETH CLOSE
WYKE
BRADFORD
BD12 8PR
- Phone:
- 01274674965
- Email:
- dhgibson@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window