MINISTRY OF RECONCILIATION COMMUNITY CENTRE LE CHANDELIER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training, medical/health/sickness, disability, relief of poverty, overseas aid/famine relief, accommodation/housing, religious activities, arts/culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 09 September 2004: Standard registration
- MRC CHANDELIER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MULAMBA MASANKA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JUSTINE KIRONGOZI | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.23k | £2.23k | £7.97k | £9.05k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £960 | £960 | £2.46k | £4.00k | £7.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 February 2023 | 386 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2023 | 749 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 AUGUST 2002, AS AMENDED 18 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS FROM DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO AND OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE IN SUCH MATTERS AS HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM NECESSARY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 19
Tenby Court
Tenby Road
London
E17 7AT
- Phone:
- 07424266492
- Email:
- masankamulamba@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window