Trustees THE ROTHERHAM U3A

Charity Number: 1103937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heather Mallan Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Anne Hamer Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Mandy Martin Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Gary Swift Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Howard Bruce Cable Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Susan Cable Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Rita Christine Beresford Trustee 04 September 2018
None on record
PATRICIA MACREDIE Trustee 25 August 2017
None on record
LESLEY WHITE Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record