Financial history FRIENDS OF THE CONVENT OF JESUS AND MARY INFANT SCHOOL AND NURSERY

Charity number: 1103910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £23.61k £10.86k £11.73k £14.76k £7.83k
Total expenditure £20.33k £1.40k £23.71k £16.17k £3.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A