Financial history REMARKABLE AUTISM LTD

Charity Number: 1104715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.06m £4.94m £5.33m £5.82m £8.10m
Total expenditure £3.99m £4.44m £4.78m £5.20m £6.71m
Income from government contracts £3.89m £4.76m £5.05m £5.57m N/A
Income from government grants £130.24k £141.52k £220.10k £178.91k £257.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.61k £0 £0 £30.81k £253.02k
Income - Other trading activities £15.07k £17.04k £3.01k £1.19k £1.49k
Income - Charitable activities £4.02m £4.90m £5.27m £5.75m £7.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.97k £8.82k £6.89k £25.17k £31.82k
Income - Other £2.90k £14.09k £46.85k £12.62k £2.94k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £30.81k £546
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.99m £4.44m £4.78m £5.20m £6.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £149.72k £159.23k £171.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0