YESODEY HATORAH TRUST

Charity Number: 1103911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to organisations. Provides Human Resources. Provides buildings/facilities/open space.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £60,833
Total expenditure: £58,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSEPH SCHLEIDER Chair
ZEIRE AGUDA
Received: On time
THE ZEIRE AGUDATH ISRAEL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
AGUDAS ISRAEL ORGANISATION OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Chaim Pinter Trustee 14 May 2020
YHS TRUST
Received: On time
THE GOLDERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BE'ER MIRIAM TRUST
Received: On time
ROBERT SCHIFFER Trustee
CHITOV LIMITED
Received: On time
SIDNEY SAMUEL SINITSKY Trustee
BEROSA CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
TAGMARSH CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE MA'OS YESOMIM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
YESODEY HATORAH NURSERY
Received: On time
SIDE BY SIDE (CHILDREN) LIMITED
Received: On time
YHS TRUST
Received: On time
S & J CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £151.03k £89.96k £101.49k £189.12k £60.83k
Total expenditure £165.73k £288.50k £166.58k £103.43k £58.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 June 2021 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 June 2021 131 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 CRAVEN WALK
LONDON
N16 6BS
Phone:
07966153532
Website:

No information available