ORCHID CONSERVATION INTERNATIONAL LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote, for the benefit of the public, the preservation and conservation of rare and endangered species of orchids and their habitats. Advance education of the public generally about such orchids. Conduct research into orchids and to publish, or arrange for the publishing of the results. Awarding of grants for the above activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2004: Standard registration
- 21 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- OCI (Working name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £13 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF RARE AND ENDANGERED SPECIES OF ORCHIDS AND THEIR HABITATS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ABOUT SUCH ORCHIDS (C) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO SUCH ORCHIDS AND TO PUBLISH OR ARRANGE FOR THE PUBLISHING OF THE RESULTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window