FRIENDS OF CME (CENTRE MEDICAL EVANGELIQUE) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity works to advance education and relieve sickness and poverty, particularly but not exclusively, by supporting the work of Centre Medical Evangelique in the Democratic Republic of Congo
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 04 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Morrell | Trustee | 31 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS HEARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JUSTIN THOMAS BURDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REMY TOKO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS ALMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.10k | £55.25k | £45.80k | £65.47k | £56.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.16k | £95.00k | £38.11k | £79.26k | £48.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY IN COMMUNITY HEALTH PROMOTION, DISEASE AND SICKNESS PREVENTION AND IN THE FORM OF MEDICAL PERSONNEL TRAINING, AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF CENTRE MEDICAL EVANGELIQUE ("CME"), IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, EQUIPMENT, OTHER RESOURCES AND ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Corner Field Cottage
Main Street
South Scarle
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG23 7JH
- Phone:
- 07801750992
- Email:
- info@friendsofcme.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window