HERTFORD TOWN YOUTH F.C.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Football Club - which provides football training and games for boys & girls from the age of 4 to 19 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 June 2004: Standard registration
- HTYFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GOODEY | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nash | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Robin Dass | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £251 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
A. TO ORGANISE, PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE BOYS AND GIRLS UP TO 18 YEARS OF AGE RESIDENT IN HERTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO PLAY ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL, PERSONAL AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF SAID BOYS AND GIRLS AND TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS. B. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, PARTICULARLY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
HERTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23-25 MAIDENHEAD STREET
HERTFORD
SG14 1DW
- Phone:
- 07944347590
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window