Governance CROSSROADS CARE EAST ANGLIA LIMITED
Charity number: 1103959
Removed charity
Registration history:
- 26 May 2004: Standard registration
- 13 March 2015: Funds received from 1090844 UTTLESFORD CROSSROADS- CARING FOR CARERS
- 20 March 2015: Funds received from 1130265 CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS IN NORWICH AND EAST N...
- 01 April 2015: Funds received from 1091389 WEST SUFFOLK CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS
- 26 June 2015: Funds received from 1094267 CROSS ROADS CARE SOUTH EAST SUFFOLK
- 17 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- CROSSROADS CARE IN NORFOLK (Working name)
- CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS IN NORFOLK LTD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.