INTOART PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts provision for adults and young people with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £216,156 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 28 September 2004: Standard registration
- In To Art (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Sharp | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roseanna Elizabeth Gooder | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Roeg | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Jane Sutherland | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Farrow | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Orgill | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dewar | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.93k | £243.64k | £268.16k | £327.99k | £431.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.97k | £159.63k | £257.00k | £350.90k | £389.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £1.11k | £156.06k | £216.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE VISUAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Studio 306
Peckham Levels
Peckham Town Centre Carpark
95a Rye Lane
London
SE15 4ST
- Phone:
- 0203 4094542
- Email:
- info@intoart.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window